THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:40:25 PM
Tkachuk, Douglas Cameron
CPSO#:
51953
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: 416912-5033
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:31 May 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS CAMERON TKACHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TKACHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 12 Jan 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2002 |