THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:50:36 AM
Thompson, Alan Aubrey
CPSO#:
51942
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alan A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 4 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2021 |