THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:38:41 PM
Torbicki, Edward Alphonse
CPSO#:
51930
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edward Torbicki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Grand River Hospital, 835 King St W, Kitchener, Ontario N2G 1G3
St Mary's General Hospital, 911 Queen's Blvd, Kitchener, Ontario N2M 1B2
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jan 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2019 |