THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:55:13 PM
Frenkel, Vivien Joyce
CPSO#:
51928
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vivien J. Frenkel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 17, 2017, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that Dr. Vivien Joyce Frenkel, on March 3, 2017, had voluntarily restricted her practice to exclude cytology services following an internal quality review.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:08 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2021 |