THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:20:17 AM
Lotfallah, Talaat Kamel
CPSO#:
51926
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 22 Jun 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jul 2021 |