THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:05:00 PM
Riddick, Elaine Patricia
CPSO#:
51908
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E.P. Riddick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:30 BEDALE DRIVE NEPEAN FOR RECORDS PRIOR TO 2016.
FROM 2016 TO 2021 ALL RECORDS ARE AT THE RICHMOND MEDICAL CENTRE, 6265-2 PERTH STREET RICHMOND, ONTARIO K0A2Z0
Date Received: 20 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:23 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jan 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |