THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:31:58 PM
Wilkinson, Jane Elizabeth
CPSO#:
51896
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
13 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jane Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Milton Centre for Women's Health
208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton, ON L9T 3Z9
Date Received: 13 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:26 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2018 |