THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:06:16 AM
Zipursky, Robert Baruch
CPSO#:
51886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen St. W.
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 33471
Fax: 416-583-1302
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Zipursky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BARUCH ZIPURSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIPURSKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1986 |