THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:16:36 PM
Yee, Doreen Anna
CPSO#:
51883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue, M-3200
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOREEN ANNA YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1983 |