THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:35:35 AM
Murphy, Leo Merlin
CPSO#:
51877
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 94006
Toronto RPO
Bedford ON M4N 3R1
Phone: 416 923 9688
Electoral District: 00
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEO MERLIN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1985 |