THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 7:45:42 AM
Valadka, Mikas Algis
CPSO#:
51863
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Lithuanian
Education: Julius Maximilian University at Wurzburg, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.A. Valadka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:137 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M6R 2L2
Date Received: 19 May 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Janak Patel at 416-769-2415.
Date Received: 15 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |