THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:14:49 AM
Gardner-Nix, Jacqueline Sally
CPSO#:
51854
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Feb 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gardner, Jacqueline Sally (used until: 29 Aug 1993 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
51 Greenaway Circle
Port Hope ON L1A 0C1
Phone: (416) 461-4333
Fax: 866-217-0746
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gardner-Nix Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SALLY GARDNER-NIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDNER-NIX is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |