THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:33:29 PM
Shipley, James Henry
CPSO#:
51811
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Shipley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
150 Strickland St
Lakefield, ON K0L 2H0
Tel: (705) 651-5000
Date Received: 04 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Henry Shipley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 20, 2016:
Dr. Shipley has ceased to practise medicine for personal reasons at this time and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any clinical services. He has agreed to provide notice of his intent to return to the clinical practice of medicine, and to abide by the College’s policy on “Re-entering Practice” should he do so.