THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:26:42 PM
Simpson, Robert Clifford
CPSO#:
51804
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT CLIFFORD SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Nov 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1989 |