THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:05:28 AM
Wilkins, Douglas Frank
CPSO#:
51777
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4588
Fax: (613) 761-4177
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS FRANK WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1989 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1998 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1999 |