THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:07:50 PM
Sirman, Mehmet Rauf
CPSO#:
51770
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Turkish
Education: Istanbul University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
120 Napier St
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
Phone: 6476281446
Fax: (519) 612-3331
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHMET RAUF SIRMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIRMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1997 |