THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:58:10 PM
Sischek, William Joseph
CPSO#:
51769
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wm. J. Sischek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 28 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2023 |