THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:47:06 PM
Krstich, Desanka
CPSO#:
51764
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
121 Howard Park Avenue
Toronto ON M6R 1V7
Phone: (416) 537-8256
Fax: (416) 537-4315
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Desanka Krstich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 23 2021
Corporation Name: Desanka Krstich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DESANKA KRSTICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRSTICH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1983 |