THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:46:04 AM
Roberts, Nasreen
CPSO#:
51759
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nasreen Roberts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston Health Sciences Centre, Kingston Ontario
166 Brock St
Kingston, ON
K7L 5G2
Date Received: 04 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: February 4, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Nasreen Roberts was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Sexual assault, between July 1, 1994 and December 31, 1998, at or near Banff, Alberta, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: September 15, 2021
SENTENCE:
1. Imprisonment of two years less a day to be served within the community with conditions (as set out below);
2. Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years;
3. Comply with a DNA Order under s. 487.06(1) of the Criminal Code.
Conditions
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Report to a supervisor within two working days and thereafter when required by the supervisor and in the manner directed by the supervisor.
4. Remain within the jurisdiction of the court unless written permission to go outside that jurisdiction is obtained from the court or the supervisor.
5. Notify the court or the supervisor in advance of any change of name or address, and promptly notify the court or the supervisor of any change of employment or occupation.
See attached for additional 19 conditions
Download Full Document (PDF)