THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:07:45 AM
Reen, Mehar Singh
CPSO#:
51756
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Raina, Mehar Singh (used until: 27 Jul 1983 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Kashmir University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
113-820 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Phone: 613 933 8990
Fax: 613 933 8997
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:03 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHAR SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Aug 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 6 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1996 |