THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:39:56 PM
Robbins, Stephanie Joan
CPSO#:
51693
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Drs. Foster and Robbins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2200 Fairview St
Suite 103
Burlington,
On
L7R 4H3
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2022 |