THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:57:29 PM
Scott, Leslie Alanna
CPSO#:
51682
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. A. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 9 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
Date Received: 22 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric General Surgery |
Effective:09 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2022 |