THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:03:30 PM
Patterson, Janet Alice
CPSO#:
51657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave. E.
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANET ALICE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1988 |