THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:10:54 PM
Hunt, Allan Jeffrey Anthony
CPSO#:
51650
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Jamaican Creole
Education: University of the West Indies, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratories
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Campus
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7388
Fax: (416) 281-7486
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:13 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:01 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLAN JEFFREY ANTHONY HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1985 |