THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:03:54 PM
Fox, Ricky
CPSO#:
51640
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2489 Bloor Street West
Suite 301
Toronto ON M6S 1R6
Phone: (416) 767-3171
Fax: (416) 766-6896
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICKY FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1987 |