THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:48:15 AM
Sharp, Daniel Charles
CPSO#:
51631
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
17 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Daniel C. Sharp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1931 Queens Street East
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6A 2G8
Date Received: 17 Jul 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:21 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2020 |