THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:23:13 AM
Rajani, Shabnam Sethi
CPSO#:
51618
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Oct 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sethi, Shabnam (used until: 26 May 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:09 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHABNAM SETHI RAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1987 |