THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:51:15 PM
Schulz, Valerie Marie Nocent
CPSO#:
51594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital PO Box 5339
Room B3 408
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VALERIE MARIE NOCENT SCHULZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 03 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 1984 |