THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:47:59 PM
Schoales, Blair Robert
CPSO#:
51591
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 623-3744
Fax: (807) 622-6885
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BLAIR ROBERT SCHOALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOALES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1985 |