THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:36:28 PM
Sanders, Kenneth Cameron
CPSO#:
51566
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Sanders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:20 Inverness Ave W
Hamilton, ON
L9C 1A2
Date Received: 09 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2022 |