THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:06:22 PM
Samson, Elizabeth Ann
CPSO#:
51562
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Samson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Nanette Gad
1450 Highway 2 East Courtice, Ontario, L1E 3C3 (905) 721-4051
Date Received: 20 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |