THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:52:56 AM
Rousseau, Erella
CPSO#:
51528
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rousseau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 21 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1983 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERELLA ROUSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEAU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1983 |