THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:41:18 AM
Remington, Gary James
CPSO#:
51490
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 College Street
Toronto ON M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34750
Fax: (416) 979-4292
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY JAMES REMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 1984 to 31 Dec 1984
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1996 |