THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:03:01 AM
Reid, Ken Ross
CPSO#:
51484
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2383
Fax: (613) 548-6085
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEN ROSS REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 1989 |