THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:29:21 PM
Reade, Elizabeth Ann
CPSO#:
51476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Apr 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Apr 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
161 Hume Rd
Puslinch ON N0B2J0
Phone: 5198366385
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN READE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1992 |