THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:24:59 AM
Rathbone, Michel Piers
CPSO#:
51469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Medicine (Div. Neurology)
McMaster University - JH
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 574-8630
Fax: (905) 383-3958
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:28 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL PIERS RATHBONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1999 |