THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:14:30 AM
Rao, Pramila
CPSO#:
51465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Andhra University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRAMILA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1994 |