THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:07:48 AM
Rahim, Yasmin Hussain
CPSO#:
51461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Oct 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Dow Medical College, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6596
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:07 Sep 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:29 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMIN HUSSAIN RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 1987 |