THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:03:17 PM
Raco, Dominic Lorenzo
CPSO#:
51457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Room N 2 918
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOMINIC LORENZO RACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1984 |