THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:20:32 AM
Nisker, William Alan
CPSO#:
51453
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C-1160 Blair Rd
Burlington ON L7M 1K9
Phone: 905-331-3101
Fax: 905-319-2499
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALAN NISKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NISKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1983 |