THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:11:45 PM
McFadyen, Craig Alexander
CPSO#:
51436
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Dec 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. A. McFadyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 1, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 25, 2011, Grand River Hospital and St. Mary's General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Craig A. McFadyen's privileges were restricted, effective November 1, 2011. The restrictions were removed on September 4, 2012.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2019 |