THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:21:34 AM
Kratky, Vladimir
CPSO#:
51434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Room 262D
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2169
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kratky O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018
Corporation Name: Kratky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VLADIMIR KRATKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRATKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1985 |