THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:54:56 AM
Kaizer, Leonard
CPSO#:
51416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
26 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Apr 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kaizer & Friefeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2022 |