THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:31:47 AM
Friefeld, Joanne Minda
CPSO#:
51411
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kaizer & Friefeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:09 Sep 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2022 |