THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:38:56 AM
Prasad, Sadhana
CPSO#:
51402
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: McMaster University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 5193762121
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sadhana Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:12 May 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SADHANA PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1985 |