THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:42:12 PM
Howson-Jan, Kang
CPSO#:
51384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52169
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KANG HOWSON-JAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWSON-JAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1991 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)