THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:22:20 AM
Hayashida, Peter John Kaye
CPSO#:
51378
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hayashida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to request their medical records can contact Dr. Vishal Sharma
Suite 504
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
(905) 426-2815
Date Received: 10 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2022 |