THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:57:22 AM
Khan, Badarunisa Begum
CPSO#:
51377
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Sep 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: Osmania University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Badarunisa B. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 29 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:3202-181 Wynford Drive, North York, Ontario M3C 0C6
Date Received: 08 Jan 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2020 |