THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:22:33 PM
Parlow, Carol Marian
CPSO#:
51359
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1857 Bowker Pl
Victoria BC V8R 6N1
Phone: 9054664003
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Parlow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
Date Received: 03 Mar 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Mar 2022 |