THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:25:43 PM
Parnes, Lorne Stephen
CPSO#:
51332
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital B1-333
Department Of Otolaryngology
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3604
Fax: (519) 663-3916
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:07 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LORNE STEPHEN PARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1985 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1985 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Mar 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1987 |